Home >
About the UGC >
Committee Structure
>
University Grants Committee
> Attendance Record of UGC Members from 1 January 2023 to 31
December 2023
Attendance Record of UGC Members from 1 January 2023 to 31 December 2023
Current UGC Members' attendance at the meetings of the
UGC, its sub-committees and groups
(from 1 January 2023 to 31 December 2023)
Name | Total number of meetings of the UGC, sub-committees and groups to which he/she is a member^ | Number of meetings attended | Attendance rate |
---|---|---|---|
Chairman | |||
Mr Tim Lui Tim-leung |
13
|
13
|
100%
|
Members | |||
Professor David Cardwell* |
5
|
5
|
100%
|
Ms Diana Cesar |
4
|
4
|
100%
|
Professor Alan Chan Kam-leung |
10
|
10
|
100%
|
Dr Benjamin Chan Wai-kai |
5
|
5
|
100%
|
Professor Tim Cheng Kwang-ting |
4
|
4
|
100%
|
Professor Arnoud De Meyer* |
13
|
11
|
85%
|
Professor Gao Song* |
4
|
3
|
75%
|
Professor Lino Guzzella* |
1
|
1
|
100%
|
Professor Ian Holliday |
7
|
6
|
86%
|
Professor Mark Kamlet* |
7
|
6
|
86%
|
Professor Ka Yee C. Lee* |
7
|
6
|
86%
|
Professor Sir Anton Muscatelli* |
14
|
13
|
93%
|
Mr Joseph Luc Ngai |
4
|
3
|
75%
|
Mr Philip Tsai Wing-chung |
8
|
8
|
100%
|
Professor Shearer West* |
7
|
6
|
86%
|
Professor Wong Wai-kwok |
6
|
6
|
100%
|
Professor Wong Wing-tak |
10
|
10
|
100%
|
Professor Xu Ningsheng* |
4
|
4
|
100%
|
Mr Dieter Yih |
8
|
8
|
100%
|
Ms Helen Zee |
4
|
4
|
100%
|
Ex-officio Members | |||
Ir Dr Alex Chan Siu-kun |
-
|
-
|
N/A#
|
Professor Jan Thomas* |
6
|
6
|
100%
|
Professor Timothy Wai-cheung Tong |
-
|
-
|
N/A#
|
* | Members based outside Hong Kong |
^ | This number may vary for each member depending on the respective date of appointment to UGC and the sub-committees/groups concerned |
# | Ir Dr Alex Chan Siu-kun was appointed as Ex-officio Member of the UGC on 1 November 2023; Professor Timothy Wai-cheung Tong was appointed as Ex-officio Member of the UGC on 1 March 2024 |